Global Patent Index - EP 0682797 B1

EP 0682797 B1 2000-09-20 - DRIVE ASSEMBLIES

Title (en)

DRIVE ASSEMBLIES

Title (de)

ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNGEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE D'ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 0682797 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94904716 A

Priority

  • GB 9301445 A
  • GB 9313004 A
  • GB 9400139 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9417500A1] A drive assembly (10), which is particularly suitable for use in a gaming machine, comprises a strip (12) with symbols (50) arranged in a continuous loop, and a plurality of parallel and rotatable supports (16) around which the strip (12) is wrapped, with preferably only one of the rotatable supports (16) being driven by an electrical stepper motor (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3213 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

ES 505262 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9417500 A1 19940804; AU 5864794 A 19940815; EP 0682797 A1 19951122; EP 0682797 B1 20000920; ES 2152302 T3 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140124

2014-02-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140124

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060126

2006-01-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-02-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152302 T3

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES GB

1999-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STARPOINT ELECTRICS LIMITED

1996-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960717

1995-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950824

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GB