Global Patent Index - EP 0682964 B1

EP 0682964 B1 2002-12-11 - Set of mutually articulated elements

Title (en)

Set of mutually articulated elements

Title (de)

Satz von miteinander gelenkig verbundenen Elementen

Title (fr)

Ensemble d'éléments articulés les uns aux autres

Publication

EP 0682964 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95107132 A

Priority

CH 152294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682964A2] Each of the components (A,B) in the assembly has at least one straight edge equipped with prongs (A1,A2,B1,B2) which are all of the same length and have recesses (1) and projections (2) on opposite faces of their free ends which enable two components to be joined together and pivot relative to one another. The prongs on opposite components are offset relative to one another and in different numbers, e.g. four on one component and five on the other, allowing the components to be positioned symmetrically when their prongs are engaged. The number of prongs also allows more than one pair of components to be joined together, all able to pivot by means of the linked projections and recesses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63H 33/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682964 A2 19951122; EP 0682964 A3 19960508; EP 0682964 B1 20021211; DE 69529117 D1 20030123; DE 69529117 T2 20030911

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2005-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050521

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-06-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021211

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69529117 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-12-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990914

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960619

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI