Global Patent Index - EP 0682999 B1

EP 0682999 B1 2001-02-07 - Article molded from metal powder and process and apparatus for preparing the same

Title (en)

Article molded from metal powder and process and apparatus for preparing the same

Title (de)

Pressteil aus Metallpulver, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Article moulé, procédé et installation pour sa préparation

Publication

EP 0682999 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105492 A

Priority

DE 4417663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682999A2] Pressed metal powder part, esp. sintered part, with one or more re-entrant grooves, in which the re-entrant groove is formed by an additional finish pressing operation on a preformed compact. A mfg. process and equipment for the above are also claimed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22F 5/00; B22F 3/03; B22F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/03 (2006.01); B22F 5/10 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/164 (2013.01); B22F 3/03 (2013.01); B22F 5/10 (2013.01); B30B 15/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682999 A2 19951122; EP 0682999 A3 19970507; EP 0682999 B1 20010207; DE 4417663 A1 19951123; DE 4417663 C2 20031204; ES 2154691 T3 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150413

2015-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-04-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509008

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140505

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120412

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120412

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110419

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110427

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154691 T3

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509008 20010315

2001-03-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010207

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GKN SINTER METALS GMBH

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990118

1999-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GKN SINTER METALS HOLDING GMBH

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971105

1997-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KREBSOEGE SINTERHOLDING GMBH

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT