Global Patent Index - EP 0683055 B1

EP 0683055 B1 2000-05-24 - Economic use of impression transfer material printing method

Title (en)

Economic use of impression transfer material printing method

Title (de)

Druckverfahren mit wirtschaftlicher Ausnutzung des Übertragungsmaterials

Title (fr)

Méthode d'impression avec utilisation économique du matériau de transfert

Publication

EP 0683055 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95300931 A

Priority

  • GB 9410273 A
  • GB 9419469 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0683055A2] A method of printing is described which utilises a printing head (11) having a plurality of printing elements each of which is operable to transfer a pixel print medium from a carrier (12) on to an adjacent substrate, the method comprising the steps of: a) causing relative movement between the substrate and carrier (12), and the print head (11), such that the print head (11) moves relative to an area of the carrier (12) from a start position to an end position whilst utilising some or all of the printing elements to transfer a first set of pixels of print medium from the area of the carrier (12) on to the substrate; b) causing relative movement between the print head (11) and the carrier (12)to replace the print head (11) at the start position; c) causing relative movement between the carrier (12) and the substrate such that fresh substrate is presented adjacent to the area of the carrier (12), and d) causing relative movement between fresh substrate and the carrier (12), and the print head (11), such that the print head (11) moves relative to the area of the carrier (12) again from the start position to the end position whilst utilising some or all of the printing elements, to transfer a second set of pixels of the print medium from the area of the carrier (12), onto the adjacent fresh substrate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 17/12; B41J 33/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/12 (2006.01); B41J 33/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/12 (2013.01); B41J 33/54 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

US 5017028 A 19910521 - HARDING PAUL R [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0683055 A2 19951122; EP 0683055 A3 19961106; EP 0683055 B1 20000524; AU 2008595 A 19951130; AU 693532 B2 19980702; DE 69517089 D1 20000629; DE 69517089 T2 20001102; ES 2121707 T1 19981216; ES 2121707 T3 20000716

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150214

2015-03-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20150214

2015-02-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-02-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARKEM-IMAJE LIMITED, GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120710

2012-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20120710

2012-08-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

- Effective date: 20120710

2012-07-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2010-04-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2010-04-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070216

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070216

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070215

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2007-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070901

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-02-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070216

2006-03-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-07 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060205

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2121707

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517089

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-06-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1999-12-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FIAMMENGHI - DOMENIGHETTI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-12-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2121707

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1998-04-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980212

1997-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARKEM TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970502

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1996-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT NL SE