Global Patent Index - EP 0683296 B1

EP 0683296 B1 2000-01-05 - Partly automatic positionable fitting system for windows, doors or the like

Title (en)

Partly automatic positionable fitting system for windows, doors or the like

Title (de)

Teilautomatisch anschlagbares Beschlagssystem für Fenster, Türen oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Système à ferrures positionnable automatique en partie pour fenêtres, portes ou similaires

Publication

EP 0683296 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95107727 A

Priority

DE 4417842 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0683296A1] The fitment system is for doors and windows. It has at least two corner deflections (12) insertable in a casement fold circumferential groove (20). Each of them has a corner angle (14) with inverted rail coupling elements at both angled ends. A force transfer member (16) is movably mounted on the corner angle and has drive rod coupling elements (24) at both ends of the member. Each of the two corner angle arms (36a,36b) has at least one bolt member (30,34) movably mounted on the corner angle arm and coupled in movement with the force transfer member to interact with fitment parts or scissor unit on the side of the fixed frame. At least one corner deflection connecting unit (46) comprises an inverted rail section (28). A drive rod section (26) couples each rail end or rod end to the rail coupling elements or rod coupling elements of two corner deflections being connected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05C 17/00 (2006.01); E05D 15/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/1858 (2013.01); E05D 15/52 (2013.01); E05D 15/5208 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0683296 A1 19951122; EP 0683296 B1 20000105; EP 0683296 B2 20030917; AT 188531 T 20000115; CZ 288733 B6 20010815; CZ 9501300 A3 19960417; DE 4417842 A1 19951123; HU 218762 B 20001128; HU 9501484 D0 19950728; HU T71431 A 19951128; PL 177010 B1 19990930; PL 308689 A1 19951127

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090526

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080519

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2007-05-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-07-09 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-05-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20010611

2003-09-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2001-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-11-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEGENIA-FRANK KG

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-07-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000520

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507550 20000210

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188531 T 20000115

1997-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970813

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960412

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI SE