Global Patent Index - EP 0683321 B1

EP 0683321 B1 2001-05-09 - SWINGING ROTARY COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

SWINGING ROTARY COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

SCHWINGENDER ROTATIONS-KOMPRESSOR

Title (fr)

COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF OSCILLANT

Publication

EP 0683321 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95902284 A

Priority

  • JP 9402020 W
  • JP 30792493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9516136A1] A swinging rotary compressor comprising a cylinder (1) having therein a cylinder chamber (11), a roller (2) fitted in an eccentric shaft portion (31) of a driving shaft (3) and installed in the cylinder chamber (11), a blade (21) provided integrally with the roller (2) in such a manner as to protrude therefrom so as to divide the cylinder chamber (11) into a compression chamber (X) and a suction chamber (Y) and a supporting body (4) disposed in the cylinder (1) so as to freely swing therein and having a receiving groove (41) for receiving retractably the leading end of the blade (21), wherein an oil groove (22) is formed in the blade (21) and the axial end surfaces of a base portion of the roller (2) from which the blade protrudes in such a manner that the groove is open to the inner circumferential surface of the roller (2) at one end and to the protruding leading end of the blade (21) at the other end thereof, wherein a high pressure chamber (15) closed relative to the outside of the cylinder (1) is formed in the receiving groove (41) of the supporting body (4) on the back side of the blade (21), whereby sliding contact portions between the upper and lower end surfaces of the blade (21) and the roller (2), as well as between the blade (21) and the supporting body (4) for supporting the blade are positively lubricated to thereby improve the reliability.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/32; F04C 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 39/02 (2006.01); F04C 18/32 (2006.01); F04C 18/356 (2006.01); F04C 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 18/322 (2013.01); F04C 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9516136 A1 19950615; CN 1041453 C 19981230; CN 1117755 A 19960228; DE 69427186 D1 20010613; DE 69427186 T2 20010920; DK 0683321 T3 20010528; EP 0683321 A1 19951122; EP 0683321 A4 19960515; EP 0683321 B1 20010509; ES 2158069 T3 20010901; JP 3473067 B2 20031202; JP H07158574 A 19950620; MY 119158 A 20050430; SG 43887 A1 19971114

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101202

2012-02-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120220

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69427186

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090105

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091229

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20071215

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158069 T3

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427186 20010613

2001-05-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1998-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970731

1996-05-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19960401

1996-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1996-05-08 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F04C 18/32

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950929

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT