Global Patent Index - EP 0683356 B1

EP 0683356 B1 2001-01-17 - Method for operating a combustion chamber and combustion chamber

Title (en)

Method for operating a combustion chamber and combustion chamber

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Brennkammer und Brennkammer

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'une chambre de combustion et chambre de combustion

Publication

EP 0683356 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810290 A

Priority

DE 4417536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0683356A2] The process is for a chamber into which hot gas flows. Fuel (8) is blown into the hot gas over several fuel flanges (9). Self-ignition then occurs. The fuel flanges are divided into at least two groups which are supplied with gas consecutively. The supply of hot gas to the groups remain constant. The flanges are heated to a temp. in the region of 1100 degrees C. All the flanges are connected up and their temp. is raised in parallel to the required operation temp. Supporting air (10) may be supplied to the flanges along with the fuel. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 5/00; F23D 23/00; F23R 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 5/08 (2006.01); F23C 5/00 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 5/00 (2013.01); F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23R 3/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0683356 A2 19951122; EP 0683356 A3 19970618; EP 0683356 B1 20010117; CN 1116697 A 19960214; DE 4417536 A1 19951123; JP H07318008 A 19951208; US 5609017 A 19970311

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-01-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-05-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010509

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010507

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010412

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508963

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-01-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION CHAMBER AND COMBUSTION CHAMBER

2000-05-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR OPERATING A COMBUSTION CHAMBER AND COMBUSTION CHAMBER

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990715

1998-01-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971114

1997-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL