Global patent index - EP 0683367 B1

EP 0683367 B1 2000-01-19 - Lamp holding fixture for a refrigeration apparatus

Title (en)

Lamp holding fixture for a refrigeration apparatus

Title (de)

Lampenfassungsbefestigung für ein Kühlgerät

Title (fr)

Fixation de support de lampe pour un appareil de refroidissement

Publication

EP 0683367 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95105811 A

Priority

IT PN940030 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0683367A1] Lamp-holding fixture for a refrigeration apparatus, in particular a household refrigerator or freezer, comprising one or more refrigerating circuits filled with inflammable refrigerant gases and including at least a compressor, a condenser, one or more evaporators associated to one or more food storage compartments, said food storage compartments being illuminated by at least an incandescent lamp supported by a respective lamp-holding fixture (1), wherein said lamp-holding fixture comprises an internal volume (25) that is hermetically sealed off the outside environment and is provided with at least a terminal (18, 35) adapted to establish a contact with or becoming separated from electrical lead wires connected with the power supply circuit of the lamp. Said lamp-holding fixture is provided with at least an opening (10), a shiftable element (12) being arranged inside said opening so as to be able to close said opening due to the action of a spring element (14), said shiftable element (12) being further adapted to slide so as to open said opening due to the action of a terminal (5) that pushes against said moving element, and with at least a contact element (18) that is arranged substantially in a line with said opening (10) being provided inside said lamp-holding fixture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 27/00; F21V 25/12; H01R 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 25/12 (2006.01); F25D 27/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 33/965 (2006.01); H01R 33/96 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/9653 (2013.01); F21V 25/12 (2013.01); F25D 27/00 (2013.01); H01R 13/4534 (2013.01); F25B 2400/12 (2013.01); H01R 33/962 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0683367 A1 19951122; EP 0683367 B1 20000119; CN 1073688 C 20011024; CN 1126818 A 19960717; DE 69514566 D1 20000224; DE 69514566 T2 20000914; DK 0683367 T3 20000417; ES 2144064 T3 20000601; IT 1267720 B1 19970207; IT PN940030 A1 19951121; IT PN940030 D0 19940520

INPADOC legal status

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080420

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080419

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080421

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080419

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080421

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080419

2008-12-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-12-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144064

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514566

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

1999-09-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-08-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990629

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960221

1996-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE