Global Patent Index - EP 0683790 B1

EP 0683790 B1 2000-04-26 - AUTOMATED SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

AUTOMATED SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

AUTOMATISIERTE SYNTHESE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE AUTOMATISEE D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Publication

EP 0683790 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94907420 A

Priority

  • US 9401271 W
  • US 1673993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9418226A1] Apparatus and method for the automated synthesis of DNA segments utilizing multiple reaction columns (11), all of which are open at the inlet end (13) to the atmosphere of a reaction chamber (10). A moveable reagent supply line outlet (12) is positioned adjacent to the column inlet end (13) to apply reagent to each of the columns (11) according to an input sequence of delivery. The delivery sequence is under processor control. Reagents are removed from all columns (11) simultaneously through the application of vacuum (22) at the outlet end (14) of each column (11). The device enables the parallel synthesis of large numbers of different oligonucleotide sequences of different lengths.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 1/04; B01J 19/00; C07K 17/00; C12M 1/36; G05D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12M 1/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/00 (2006.01); C07K 1/04 (2006.01); C12M 1/36 (2006.01); C40B 40/06 (2006.01); C40B 60/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 19/0046 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00286 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00308 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00364 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00416 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00418 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00423 (2013.01); B01J 2219/005 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00585 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0059 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00596 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00689 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00695 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00722 (2013.01); C40B 40/06 (2013.01); C40B 60/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9418226 A1 19940818; DE 69424151 D1 20000531; DE 69424151 T2 20000921; EP 0683790 A1 19951129; EP 0683790 A4 19960313; EP 0683790 B1 20000426; JP H08506813 A 19960723; US 5368823 A 19941129; US 5541314 A 19960730

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140205

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140203

2014-02-28 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: THE *UNIVERSITY OF GEORGIA RESEARCH FOUNDATION INC

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-02-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140203

2014-02-12 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-02-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424151

2013-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424151 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980924

1996-03-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19960129

1996-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950717

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL