Global Patent Index - EP 0683884 B1

EP 0683884 B1 2001-02-28 - ADJUSTABLE BLUE-FLAME BURNER

Title (en)

ADJUSTABLE BLUE-FLAME BURNER

Title (de)

EINSTELLBARER BLAUBRENNER

Title (fr)

BRULEUR A FLAMME BLEUE AJUSTABLE

Publication

EP 0683884 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95905078 A

Priority

  • DE 4343430 A
  • DE 4430888 A
  • EP 9404205 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9516883A1] The invention concerns a liquid-fuel or gas-fuel burner comprising a housing containing a nozzle assembly with a nozzle which produces a jet of fuel, a combustion chamber in which the fuel jet broadens out, and a fan designed to force a stream of combustion air into the combustion chamber, the fuel jet burning in the combustion air in the combustion chamber with a blue flame. In order to improve the burner to enable different outputs to be obtained, the invention proposes that the nozzle can be adjusted to regulate the rate of flow of fuel through it, that the combustion chamber is designed to allow different recirculation-flow patterns to be formed and that the combustion-air stream enters the combustion chamber at a location relative to the fuel jet such that, at every setting of the air and fuel flow rates, the air stream stabilizes the recirculation flow necessary to produce a blue flame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/40; F23C 9/00; F23D 11/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/28 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23C 9/00 (2013.01); F23D 11/28 (2013.01); F23D 11/40 (2013.01); F23C 2202/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9516883 A1 19950622; AT 199452 T 20010315; EP 0683884 A1 19951129; EP 0683884 B1 20010228

INPADOC legal status


2014-12-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409667

2014-12-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409667

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409667

2013-03-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59409667

- Representative's name: ,

2005-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES *ZENTRUM FUR LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-03-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021204

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021112

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-12-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-08-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409667 20010405

2001-03-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199452 T 20010315

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970808

1998-02-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

1998-02-25 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970808

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950909

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE