Global Patent Index - EP 0683993 B1

EP 0683993 B1 2000-04-05 - Connection device for a wrist-watch strap

Title (en)

Connection device for a wrist-watch strap

Title (de)

Anschlussvorrichtung für ein Uhrarmband

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un bracelet à une montre

Publication

EP 0683993 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94810367 A

Priority

  • EP 94810367 A
  • EP 94810134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0683993A1] The end, or last link, of the strap (20) has a protuberance (21) with two pegs (22,23) projecting from opposite sides on a common axis (27) parallel to the edge (16) of the wrist-watch case (10). When the protuberance is pushed into a recess (11) in the end of the case, both pegs spring into a groove (13), while a threshold (14) across the entrance to the recess engages in a matching slot (24) in the underside of the protuberance behind the two pegs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0683993 A1 19951129; EP 0683993 B1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130625

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100622

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100622

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100622

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-05-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423878 20000511

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981001

1996-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960503

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI