Global Patent Index - EP 0684052 B1

EP 0684052 B1 2000-01-12 - A frame for a fire damper

Title (en)

A frame for a fire damper

Title (de)

Rahmen für eine Brandschutzklappe

Title (fr)

Cadre pour un clapet coupe-feu

Publication

EP 0684052 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95850080 A

Priority

SE 9401420 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684052A2] A four-sided fire damper frame for air ducts in ventilation systems, comprising a number of reciprocally connected frame elements (10, 11). These are provided with a substantially U-shaped cross section with a web (16, 21) and two side shanks (15, 19), wherein the duct section is formed by the web of connected frame elements (16, 21). Two opposite frame sides (11) are provided with bearings (14) for one or more blades (12) mounted on pivotal axes (13). Each of the other two frame elements (10) is provided with a sheet metal strip (18) which forms a tension joint, at a distance from the respective web (21), along the respective frame element (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 2/14 (2013.01); F24F 13/15 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0098 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0684052 A2 19951129; EP 0684052 A3 19960605; EP 0684052 B1 20000112; DE 69514411 D1 20000217; DE 69514411 T2 20000803; FI 107350 B 20010713; FI 951827 A0 19950418; FI 951827 A 19951026; SE 501542 C2 19950313; SE 9401420 D0 19940425; SE 9401420 L 19950313

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-05-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030502

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2001-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69514411

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981005

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960703

1996-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL