Global Patent Index - EP 0684206 B1

EP 0684206 B1 2000-07-26 - Hand or motor-driven hoisting device

Title (en)

Hand or motor-driven hoisting device

Title (de)

Hand- oder motorisch betriebenes Hebezeug

Title (fr)

Engin de levage à actionnement par main ou par moteur

Publication

EP 0684206 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810326 A

Priority

CH 163294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684206A1] The lifting jack has a load carrier coupled to a drive element via a lifting transmission (9), which is fitted to the drive shaft (11) of the drive element, between the drive element and a friction coupling (14). Pref. the load carrier is coupled to the lifting transmission via a drive roller, with the drive shaft of the drive element fitting coaxially through the hub of the drive wheel (15) of the lifting transmission and coupled to the drive wheel at its driving end. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 3/20; B66D 1/04; B66D 1/14; B66D 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/04 (2006.01); B66D 1/14 (2006.01); B66D 3/12 (2006.01); B66D 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/12 (2013.01); B66D 1/04 (2013.01); B66D 1/14 (2013.01); B66D 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0684206 A1 19951129; EP 0684206 B1 20000726; CH 687874 A5 19970314; DE 59508596 D1 20000831

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070517

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060517

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060517

2005-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ZANELLA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508596 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990219

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960426

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT