Global Patent Index - EP 0684250 B1

EP 0684250 B1 2000-09-27 - New poly(pentaerythrityl diphosphonate) and its use in self-extinguishing thermoplastic compositions

Title (en)

New poly(pentaerythrityl diphosphonate) and its use in self-extinguishing thermoplastic compositions

Title (de)

Polypentaerythrityldiphosphonat und seine Verwendung in selbstverlöschenden thermoplastischen Zusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Poly(pentaerythrityldiphosphonate) et son utilisation dans des compositions autoextinctrices

Publication

EP 0684250 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95107587 A

Priority

IT MI941088 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684250A1] Poly(Pentaerythrityl diphosphonate) of formula (I): <CHEM> wherein n is an integer having a value comprised within the range of from 3 to 100. The poly(pentaerythrityl diphosphonate) of formula (I) is useful as a flame retardant additive for thermoplastic polymers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 9/6574; C07F 9/6571; C08K 5/5373

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/527 (2006.01); C07F 9/6571 (2006.01); C08G 79/02 (2006.01); C08G 79/04 (2006.01); C08K 5/52 (2006.01); C08K 5/5373 (2006.01); C08L 85/02 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 79/02 (2013.01); C07F 9/657181 (2013.01); C08K 5/5373 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0684250 A1 19951129; EP 0684250 B1 20000927; AT 196635 T 20001015; DE 69518946 D1 20001102; DE 69518946 T2 20010329; IT 1269850 B 19970415; IT MI941088 A1 19951128; IT MI941088 D0 19940527; JP H08120087 A 19960514; US 5597855 A 19970128

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-01-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-05-18 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-03-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-02-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-12-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69518946 20001102

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19950518

2000-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196635 T 20001015

2000-06-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: NEW POLY(PENTAERYTHRITYL DIPHOSPHONATE) AND ITS USE IN SELF-EXTINGUISHING THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980506

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980506

1996-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GIROLDINI, WILLIAM

1996-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RINALDI, ANTONIO

1996-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANDONI, GIANLUIGI

1996-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NERI, CARLO

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951031

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-11-29 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 950518