Global Patent Index - EP 0684392 B1

EP 0684392 B1 2000-03-08 - Safety valve

Title (en)

Safety valve

Title (de)

Sicherheitsventil

Title (fr)

Valve de sécurité

Publication

EP 0684392 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105548 A

Priority

DE 9406561 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684392A1] The common housing is assembled on a single base plate (34) and has shaped chambers to house the parallel valve elements (20). The base plate has an air inlet hole (22) , an air outlet hole (24) and a vent hole (26). The connection between the valve is a cross-connection. The valve only applies working pressure when both valve elements are correctly positioned. The air inlet is linked to pneumatic storage chambers (30) for each valve side via separate flow restrictions (28) to provide a buffer action. The connecting channels (44,46) are incorporated in the middle of the valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F15B 20/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/0871 (2013.01); F15B 20/001 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

SCHMITT, A.: "Der Hydraulik Trainer", 1980, VOGEL-VERLAG, WÜRZBURG, S. 173

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 9406561 U1 19940714; EP 0684392 A1 19951129; EP 0684392 B1 20000308

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150411

2015-05-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150411

2015-04-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59507934

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140409

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-05-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507934 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980218

1996-03-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960104

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT