Global Patent Index - EP 0684425 B1

EP 0684425 B1 2000-08-23 - Luminaire comprising at least a light source

Title (en)

Luminaire comprising at least a light source

Title (de)

Leuchte mit mindestens einem Leuchtmittel

Title (fr)

Luminaire avec au moins une source lumineuse

Publication

EP 0684425 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95101440 A

Priority

DE 4414742 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684425A2] The ring shaped fluorescent tube(1) is encircled toroidally by both reflector parts(4,5). Several anti-glare elements(3) are fixed at a distance to each other essentially the fluorescent tube(1), with one end respectively at one of reflector parts(4,5), whilst the other end of the respective anti-glare element projects freely. The inner end of the anti-glare element(3) is arranged essentially at the height of the fluorescent tube(1) at the inner reflector part(4). The end of the anti-glare element(3) fixed at the reflector(2), is fitted at the inner reflector part(4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 13/10; F21V 11/00; F21S 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 5/02 (2006.01); F21V 5/04 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/09 (2006.01); F21V 11/00 (2006.01); F21V 11/06 (2006.01); F21V 13/04 (2006.01); F21V 13/10 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01); F21V 21/04 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); F21Y 103/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 13/10 (2013.01); F21S 8/04 (2013.01); F21V 5/02 (2013.01); F21V 5/04 (2013.01); F21V 7/0016 (2013.01); F21V 7/0025 (2013.01); F21V 7/0058 (2013.01); F21V 7/09 (2013.01); F21V 11/00 (2013.01); F21V 11/06 (2013.01); F21V 13/04 (2013.01); F21V 21/04 (2013.01); F21V 33/0056 (2013.01); F21V 33/0064 (2013.01); F21V 33/0076 (2013.01); F21V 33/0092 (2013.01); F21Y 2103/33 (2016.08); F21Y 2103/37 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29501661 U1 19950824; AT 195798 T 20000915; DE 4414742 A1 19951102; EP 0684425 A2 19951129; EP 0684425 A3 19960410; EP 0684425 B1 20000823

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120202

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120202

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 195798

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59508651

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120202

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-09-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120901

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110307

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WILA GROUP LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-12-15 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WILA GROUP LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20060905

2006-11-03 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-09-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WILA GROUP LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WILA LEUCHTEN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508651

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-08-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195798

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 13/10 A, 7F 21V 11/00 B, 7F 21S 4/00 B

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990322

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960730

1996-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL