Global patent index - EP 0684427 B1

EP 0684427 B1 2001-02-28 - Rotating heat transfer device

Title (en)

Rotating heat transfer device

Title (de)

Drehende Vorrichtung zur Wärmeübertragung

Title (fr)

Dispositif rotatif de transfert de chaleur

Publication

EP 0684427 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401154 A

Priority

FR 9406282 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684427A1] The rotary unit consists of a shell or cage (2) and a crown (1) containing a charge of a material with a large heat exchange surface, a drive to rotate the cage and crown relative to one another about a vertical axis, and at least one duct (5) for introducing the effluent gas into the cage and another (6) to remove it after treatment. The crown has at least one sector (A) to connect the inlet duct at any time with the central part of the cage, and a second sector (B) to connect it with the outlet duct. The central part of the crown has an aperture (8) for a thermal or catalytic reactor which burns off or converts pollutants contained in the gases passing through it. The charge of solid material can be in the form of cryogenic nodules. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/06; F28D 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 15/00 (2006.01); F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23G 7/07 (2006.01); F23J 15/08 (2006.01); F28D 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/068 (2013.01); F28D 19/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0684427 A1 19951129; EP 0684427 B1 20010228; CA 2150000 A1 19951125; CA 2150000 C 20060214; DE 69520168 D1 20010405; DE 69520168 T2 20010621; ES 2156597 T3 20010701; FR 2720488 A1 19951201; FR 2720488 B1 19960712; JP 3655667 B2 20050602; JP H0868596 A 19960312; KR 100414430 B1 20040309; NO 304906 B1 19990301; NO 952023 A 19951127; NO 952023 D0 19950522; US 5643538 A 19970701

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2013-07-02 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110519

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110518

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110518

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110518

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2011-12-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BOURCIER JACQUES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69520168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOURCIER, JACQUES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69520168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69520168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BOURCIER, JACQUES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69520168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110329

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69520168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110329

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100520

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100602

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100519

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100526

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156597

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69520168

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-10-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ROTATING HEAT TRANSFER DEVICE

2000-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ROTATING HEAT TRANSFER DEVICE

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971125

1996-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960529

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL SE