Global Patent Index - EP 0684751 B1

EP 0684751 B1 2000-07-05 - Sound field and sound image control apparatus and method

Title (en)

Sound field and sound image control apparatus and method

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Schallfeld- und Tonbildsteuerung

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil de contrôle de champ et d'image sonores

Publication

EP 0684751 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94108134 A

Priority

EP 94108134 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0684751A1] The apparatus of the invention calculates filter coefficients for controlling sound field and sound image, based on a plurality of first impulse response signals and a pair of second impulse response signals. The plurality of first impulse response signals indicate impulse responses from loudspeakers reproducing audio signals to both ears of a listener. The pair of second impulse response signals indicate impulse responses from a reference loudspeaker at a position at which a sound image is localized to both ears of the listener. The apparatus includes: a feature extracting section for receiving the pair of second impulse response signals, for extracting parameters representing features of the pair of second impulse response signals, and for outputting parameter signals; a signal adjusting section for adjusting at least one of the plurality of first impulse response signals based on the parameter signals, and for outputting a pair of third impulse response signals having the same features as the extracted features; and a coefficient calculating section for calculating the filter coefficients for controlling the sound field and sound image, based on the plurality of first impulse response signals and the pair of third impulse response signals applied from the signal adjusting means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 1/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0684751 A1 19951129; EP 0684751 B1 20000705; DE 69425132 D1 20000810; DE 69425132 T2 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120526

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2013-03-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69425132

- Effective date: 20121201

2013-03-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120526

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425132 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-07-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

1997-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970714

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941026

1995-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL