Global Patent Index - EP 0685071 A4

EP 0685071 A4 2000-12-13 - METHOD FOR ABSOLUTE COUNTING OF RARE CELLS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ABSOLUTE COUNTING OF RARE CELLS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZU ABSOLUTER ZÄHLUNG VON SELTENEN ZELLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE COMPTAGE ABSOLU DE CELLULES RARES

Publication

EP 0685071 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95901205 A

Priority

  • US 9412952 W
  • US 15108693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9513540A1] A method for absolute counting of rare cells (i.e., < 5 %) in a sample of cells is described. The method utilizes flow cytometry and a reagent composition comprising fluorescent beads, one or more fluorescent markers that differentially react with cell populations in the sample and one or more fluorescent markers that selectively react with the rare cells. The method has particular utility in counting progenitor cells.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; G01N 33/58; G01N 33/569; G01N 33/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/49 (2006.01); G01N 15/14 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/542 (2006.01); G01N 33/569 (2006.01); G01N 33/577 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/5094 (2013.01); G01N 33/56972 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XP] MEDLINEWashington DC USA;abstract no. 95006286,abstract & C.H. CHEN ET AL.: "Automated enumeration of CD34 + cells in peripheral blood and bone marrow", JOURNAL OF HEMATOTHERAPY, vol. 3, no. 1, 1 June 1994 (1994-06-01), San José CA USA, pages 3 - 13, XP000996678C.H. CHEN ET AL.Automated enumeration of CD34 + cells in peripheral blood and bone marrowJOURNAL OF HEMATOTHERAPYSan José CA USA1994060131313
  • See also references of WO 9513540A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9513540 A1 19950518; EP 0685071 A1 19951206; EP 0685071 A4 20001213; JP 2680931 B2 19971119; JP H08501396 A 19960213

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020905

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-12-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 33/543 A, 7G 01N 33/58 B, 7G 01N 33/569 B, 7G 01N 33/50 B

1995-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950712

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL