Global Patent Index - EP 0685337 B1

EP 0685337 B1 2000-01-26 - Device for adjusting the gripper support for grippers in a turning cylinder of a perfecting printing machine

Title (en)

Device for adjusting the gripper support for grippers in a turning cylinder of a perfecting printing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verstellung der Greiferaufschlagleiste für Bogengreifer in einer Wendetrommel einer Schön- und Widerdruckmachine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour régler la surface d'appui des pinces d'un ensemble à pinces pour feuilles dans un cylindre de retournement d'une machine d'impression recto-verso

Publication

EP 0685337 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95105578 A

Priority

DE 9408714 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685337A2] A gripper impact strip (4) is associated with each sheet gripper of a row of grippers. The holding plates of the impact strip are fixed on a swivel shaft (1). Each holding plate (2) has a groove (3) aligned axially parallel with the swivel shaft. The impact strip is mounted in the groove and has an integrated setting device (6,8) which acts in the radial direction and which is coupled to a servo drive fitted easily accessible on the turning drum. The setting device can be a thrust cam gear formed by a wedge (6) and draw strip (8) or by a wedge and roller guided by a pin in the strip. The servo drive can be formed by a screw gear operated manually or by motor. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 21/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 21/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9408714 U1 19940721; AT 189161 T 20000215; EP 0685337 A2 19951206; EP 0685337 A3 19961227; EP 0685337 B1 20000126

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050413

2004-04-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040413

2003-04-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030403

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020413

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010410

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010316

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507678 20000302

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189161 T 20000215

1999-11-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971024

1996-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1995-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950505

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI