Global Patent Index - EP 0685341 B1

EP 0685341 B1 2001-04-25 - Image recording apparatus and recording method

Title (en)

Image recording apparatus and recording method

Title (de)

Gerät und Verfahren zum Aufzeichnen von Bildern

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé d'enregistrement d'images

Publication

EP 0685341 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95303652 A

Priority

JP 11926594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685341A1] The present invention provides an image recording apparatus which is capable of recording high-quality images on various recording materials by setting optimum recording conditions in accordance with the types and applications of the recording materials. In the recording apparatus, one of reflection and transmission modes for an OHP film is selected by an operating unit. When the reflection mode is selected, a recording head is scanned once for recording an image for one recording width of the OHP film. When the transmission mode is selected, the recording head is scanned twice for recording an image for one recording width of the OHP film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/205; B41J 2/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/205 (2006.01); B41J 2/36 (2006.01); B41J 2/485 (2006.01); B41J 2/505 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/36 (2013.01); B41J 2/2052 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685341 A1 19951206; EP 0685341 B1 20010425; DE 69520767 D1 20010531; DE 69520767 T2 20010906; JP H07323607 A 19951212

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-07-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050516

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-04-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520767 20010531

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-04-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010425

1997-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970205

1996-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960417

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT