Global Patent Index - EP 0685564 B1

EP 0685564 B1 2000-01-12 - Copper-zinc-manganese alloy for the production of articles coming into direct and prolonged contact with the human skin

Title (en)

Copper-zinc-manganese alloy for the production of articles coming into direct and prolonged contact with the human skin

Title (de)

Kupfer-Zink-Manganlegierung zur Herstellung von Gegenständen, die in längeren direkten Kontakt mit der menschlichen Haut kommen

Title (fr)

Alliage cuivre-zinc-manganèse pour la fabrication d'articles venant en contact direct et prolongé avec la peau humaine

Publication

EP 0685564 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94830269 A

Priority

EP 94830269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685564A1] An alloy suitable for replacing Cu-Ni-Zn alloys for use in spectacles and other opticians' products, jewellery and cutlery, with substantially the same aesthetic characteristics and workability but without the risk of the release of noxious elements; the alloy has the following nominal composition by weight: from 50% - 70% Cu; from 8% - 25% Mn, from 0.05% - 1% Sn, the rest being Zn with possible small additions of Mg (from 0.01 - 0.1% by weight).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 1/00; C22C 9/04; C22C 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 9/04 (2006.01); C22C 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 9/05 (2013.01); C22C 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685564 A1 19951206; EP 0685564 B1 20000112; AT 188747 T 20000115; DE 69422610 D1 20000217; DE 69422610 T2 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69422610

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 188747 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: PESTALOZZISTRASSE 2 POSTFACH 1416, 8201 SCHAFFHAUSEN (CH)

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120730

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120618

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69422610 20000217

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188747 T 20000115

1999-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EUROPA METALLI S.P.A.

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980319

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960523

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI