Global Patent Index - EP 0685608 B1

EP 0685608 B1 2001-12-12 - Prefabricated construction element of reinforced concrete

Title (en)

Prefabricated construction element of reinforced concrete

Title (de)

Stahlbetonfertigbauteil

Title (fr)

Elément de construction préfabriqué en béton armé

Publication

EP 0685608 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95108181 A

Priority

DE 4418911 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685608A1] The end bearing elements of the component are formed by steel profiled sections having an upper band (20) and lower band (21) with the upper band protruding up out of the concrete part. The lower band can support a bearing plate with which the steel section rests on the support structure. The steel profiled section can have a double T-profile. It is concreted into the steel concrete part over a part of its height using an anchorage element (23) formed by a rod which protrudes at right angles from the steel section and has at its lower end a plate or hook anchorage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00; E04C 3/20; E04C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/20 (2006.01); E04C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/02 (2013.01); E04C 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685608 A1 19951206; EP 0685608 B1 20011212; AT 210770 T 20011215

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150528

2015-07-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 210770 T

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150528

2015-05-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59509927

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140723

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140507

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140520

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110530

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111201

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111201

2011-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PFEIFER SEIL- UND HEBETECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100520

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-09-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ALDO ROEMPLER PATENTANWALT;BRENDENWEG 11 POSTFACH 154;9424 RHEINECK (CH)

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020422

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509927 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210770 T 20011215

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990326

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960517

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL SE