Global patent index - EP 0685647 B1

EP 0685647 B1 2000-07-05 - Hydraulic radial piston motor with variable cylinder capacity

Title (en)

Hydraulic radial piston motor with variable cylinder capacity

Title (de)

Hydraulischer Radialkolbenmotor mit veränderbarem Hubvolumen

Title (fr)

Moteur hydraulique à piston radial et à cylindrée variable

Publication

EP 0685647 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95200926 A

Priority

IT MI940840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685647A2] A variable-displacement hydraulic motor with radial cylinders supplied by a rotary fluid distributor (4) and acting on an eccentric ring (6) axially secured to a crankshaft (7) but capable of moving radially with respect thereto, being provided with a device for operating and controlling the variation of eccentricity of eccentric ring (6) with respect to crankshaft (7), which comprises at least one pair of actuating pistons (8, 9) located in counterposition to and independent of one another, arranged in a radial sense between shaft (7) and ring (6), each of which is made mechanically integral with such eccentric ring (6) via appropriate means of connection (8a, 9a), and at least one pair of cross-connected valves (10) to block the flow of the fluid operating such actuating pistons (8, 9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03C 1/04; F04B 1/07; F04B 49/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03C 1/40 (2006.01); F04B 1/07 (2006.01); F04B 49/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/125 (2013.01); F03C 1/046 (2013.01); F04B 1/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685647 A2 19951206; EP 0685647 A3 19960221; EP 0685647 B1 20000705; AT 194411 T 20000715; DE 69517751 D1 20000810; DE 69517751 T2 20001116; IT 1271634 B 19970604; IT MI940840 A1 19951030; IT MI940840 D0 19940429

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100412

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080412

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070403

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070509

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-04-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070426

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2005-09-09 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2005-02-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PARKER CALZONI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO ING. ALFREDO RAIMONDI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517751

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194411

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIVA CALZONI OLEODINAMICA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990115

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960801

1996-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI