Global Patent Index - EP 0685833 B1

EP 0685833 B1 2000-04-26 - Method for speech coding using linear prediction

Title (en)

Method for speech coding using linear prediction

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Sprachkodierung mittels linearer Prädiktion

Title (fr)

Procédé de codage de parole à prédiction linéaire

Publication

EP 0685833 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401262 A

Priority

FR 9406825 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685833A1] The method involves determining a spectral state (Y) from first and second states with proportionately less low frequency energy contained in the first state than the second. One of two quantisation modes is applied to determine quantisation values of the coefficients of a synthesis filter. The determined spectral state is not modified when the energy is less than a certain threshold. Each frame is detected to determine whether the signal is in the first or second state and the state is modified if several successive frames show a different signal condition to the previous state as registered by a counter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/038 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/038 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685833 A1 19951206; EP 0685833 B1 20000426; DE 69516455 D1 20000531; DE 69516455 T2 20010125; FR 2720850 A1 19951208; FR 2720850 B1 19960814; US 5642465 A 19970624

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-06-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-06-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516455 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2000-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 19/04 A, 7G 10L 101:10 Z

1999-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990803

1998-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATRA NORTEL COMMUNICATIONS

1996-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951228

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE