Global patent index - EP 0685911 B1

EP 0685911 B1 2000-03-29 - Electrical coaxial connector element comprising switching means and electrical connector including such a connector element

Title (en)

Electrical coaxial connector element comprising switching means and electrical connector including such a connector element

Title (de)

Koaxiales elektrisches Verbinderelement mit Schalt-Funktion und elektrischer Verbinder mit einem derartigen Verbinderelement

Title (fr)

Elément de connecteur électrique coaxial réalisant une commutation et connecteur électrique comprenant un tel élément de connecteur

Publication

EP 0685911 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401248 A

Priority

FR 9406528 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0685911A1] The mobile piece (15) forms a socket which has a front surface (17) accessed from the front (F) of the coupling. Its rear part (16) is a collar in connecting with the fixed conductor (10) over part of its circumference when in the contact position. The helical spring (18) holds it in place by butting against its inside front surface and against an insulating body (7). A central conductor (14) is housed in an insulating cylinder (4), closed off at the front, apart from a central orifice (6) through which passes the mobile piece and the central conductor. The insulating body has a slot (12) for an earthed plate (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/46 (2013.01); H01R 13/703 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0685911 A1 19951206; EP 0685911 B1 20000329; DE 69515929 D1 20000504; DE 69515929 T2 20001109; DK 0685911 T3 20000731; FR 2720555 A1 19951201; FR 2720555 B1 19960719

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-01-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2001-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-19 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010409

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-04

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR SE

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/646 A

1999-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: ELECTRICAL COAXIAL CONNECTOR ELEMENT COMPRISING SWITCHING MEANS AND ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR INCLUDING SUCH A CONNECTOR ELEMENT

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980821

1996-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960115

1995-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR SE