Global Patent Index - EP 0686292 B1

EP 0686292 B1 2000-07-19 - COUNTERFEIT DOCUMENT DETECTION APPARATUS

Title (en)

COUNTERFEIT DOCUMENT DETECTION APPARATUS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN VON VERFÄLSCHTEN DOKUMENTEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE DOCUMENTS CONTREFAITS

Publication

EP 0686292 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94912985 A

Priority

  • CN 93116487 A
  • US 9401972 W
  • US 2214593 A
  • US 9306313 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9419773A1] A document processing apparatus (10) incorporates a counterfeit detection system for identifying counterfeit suspect documents (22) on the basis of the magnetic characteristics of the documents (22). Each document (22) is transported within the vicinity of a magnet read head (86), which produces an electronic signal (210) in response thereto. The signal (210) from read head (86) is conditioned by a conditioning circuit (110) to be compatible with an analog-to-digital converter (304). The conditioning circuit (110) includes one or more amplifiers (130), a filter (140), a rectifier (160) and an integrator (180). The conditioned signal (220) from the integrator (180) is provided to the analog-to-digital converter (304) and is optionally limited to a compatible voltage level. As each document (22) is detected, a plurality of sampled values are obtained by the analog-to-digital converter (304). The sampled values are accumulated to produce one or more cumulative values (242, 274, 292, 404, 412) representative of the document (22). The cumulative values are compared with one or more predetermined reference values (263, 264, 276, 280, 282, 288, 402, 406, 410, 414) associated with a genuine document (22) in order to determine whether the detected document (22) is a counterfeit suspect document (22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/04 (2006.01); G07D 7/12 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01); G07F 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07D 7/04 (2013.01); G07D 7/12 (2013.01); G07D 11/00 (2013.01); G07D 11/0084 (2013.01); G07F 7/086 (2013.01); G07F 19/203 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9419773 A1 19940901; AT 194876 T 20000815; AU 6290294 A 19940914; CN 1048103 C 20000105; CN 1118631 A 19960313; DE 69425321 D1 20000824; DE 69425321 T2 20010301; EP 0686292 A1 19951213; EP 0686292 A4 19960501; EP 0686292 B1 20000719; ES 2151548 T3 20010101

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031022

2002-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020901

2002-02-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-02-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020225

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010105

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151548 T3

2000-12-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425321 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES NL

2000-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194876 T 20000815

1997-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970307

1997-03-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT AMERICA, INC.

1996-05-01 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19960313

1996-05-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES NL

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950825

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES NL