Global Patent Index - EP 0686444 B1

EP 0686444 B1 2000-03-22 - Downstream mould portion with thin sidewalls for continuous casting

Title (en)

Downstream mould portion with thin sidewalls for continuous casting

Title (de)

Stromabwärts liegendes Teil einer Stranggiesskokille mit dünnen Seitenwänden

Title (fr)

Partie en aval d'une lignotière pour coulée continue ayant des faces latérales minces

Publication

EP 0686444 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95107943 A

Priority

IT UD940093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0686444A1] Downstream mould portion with thin sidewalls for continuous casting of slabs, billets or blooms (22), which is applied to a mould (11) comprising at least a crystalliser (12) cooperating with a discharge nozzle (13) suitable to discharge the molten metal to be cast, the crystalliser (12) being associated with a closed-circuit primary cooling system with cooling fluid under pressure, the cooling system comprising a first cooling chamber (23) with an inner circulation of cooling fluid, the downstream mould portion (10) consisting of a plurality of independent elements (10a) defining a cross-section substantially the same as that of the slab, billet or bloom (22) passing through, each element (10a) of the downstream mould portion comprising at least one outer sidewall (16) and one inner sidewall (17) which define a second closed chamber (18) for the circulation of a cooling fluid under pressure, the outer sidewall (16) cooperating with means (20) to feed and means (19) to discharge the cooling fluid, the inner sidewall (17) in contact with the slab, billet or bloom (22) having a continuous resilient thickness of the order of 4 to 10 mm., the pressure of the cooling fluid being governed functionally by the thrusts and deformations of the inner sidewall (17) due to overheating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/124; B22D 11/04; B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/055 (2006.01); B22D 11/124 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1243 (2013.01); B22D 11/055 (2013.01); B22D 11/128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0686444 A1 19951213; EP 0686444 B1 20000322; AT 190879 T 20000415; CN 1048668 C 20000126; CN 1116140 A 19960207; DE 69515726 D1 20000427; DE 69515726 T2 20001123; ES 2142971 T3 20000501; IT 1267246 B1 19970128; IT UD940093 A1 19951206; IT UD940093 D0 19940606

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050524

2003-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DANIELI & C. OFFICINE MECCANICHE S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-05-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000717

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000524

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000511

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000510

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142971

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515726

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190879

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980618

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960606

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE