Global patent index - EP 0686512 B1

EP 0686512 B1 2000-04-05 - Method for restoring works of art

Title (en)

Method for restoring works of art

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Restaurierung von Kunstwerken

Title (fr)

Procédé pour restaurer des oeuvres d'art

Publication

EP 0686512 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500081 A

Priority

  • ES 9401311 A
  • ES 9402270 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0686512A1] An analysis of the work of art and its state of conservation is made. This includes the characterization of damage, simulation of missing parts and a corresponding survey of details involving the construction of graphic aids, damage maps and/or black and white photographs. Computer science techniques are used in this analysis. Later the restored images are printed onto transfer medium and applied to the work of art in order to reintegrate the missing and/or damaged areas. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44D 7/00; B44C 1/17; B44F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/17 (2006.01); B44D 7/00 (2006.01); B44F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/17 (2013.01); B44D 7/00 (2013.01); B44F 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0686512 A1 19951213; EP 0686512 B1 20000405; DE 69516038 D1 20000511; ES 2120309 A1 19981016; ES 2120309 B1 19990501

INPADOC legal status

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-07-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516038

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

1997-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970703

1996-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960606

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT