Global Patent Index - EP 0686596 B1

EP 0686596 B1 2000-08-09 - Manually- or motor actuated hoist

Title (en)

Manually- or motor actuated hoist

Title (de)

Hand- oder motorisch angetriebenes Hebezeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage manuel ou à moteur

Publication

EP 0686596 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810353 A

Priority

CH 184094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0686596A1] The lifting mechanism has a housing which comprises a suspension device (22) and surrounds a single- or multi-strand hoist. A drive member actuates a load carrier (2) driven round a drive roller (25), with a hoist drive (6) located between the drive member and a clutch in driving coupling to the load carrier. The suspension device is formed by a housing part (23) retaining the drive roller of the load carrier, forming the mounting for the roller drivingly coupled to the hoist drive at one side. Pref. the housing part is in the form of a releasably coupled part-mechanism of the hoist drive. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 3/26; B66D 3/16; B66D 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/16 (2006.01); B66D 3/20 (2006.01); B66D 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 3/26 (2013.01); B66D 3/16 (2013.01); B66D 3/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0686596 A1 19951213; EP 0686596 B1 20000809; CH 687873 A5 19970314; DE 59508619 D1 20000914

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070530

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060530

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060530

2005-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ZANELLA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508619

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980820

1996-06-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960426

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT