Global patent index - EP 0686686 B1

EP 0686686 B1 2000-01-26 - Furnace for the thermal treatment of waste and process therefor

Title (en)

Furnace for the thermal treatment of waste and process therefor

Title (de)

Ofen zur thermischen Behandlung von Abfällen und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Four de traitement thermique de déchets et procédé associé

Publication

EP 0686686 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401182 A

Priority

FR 9407220 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0686686A1] Waste travels along a rotating cylinder inside a combustion chamber. Combustible pyrolysis gases from the waste are piped to a nozzle (9b) in the combustion chamber. Air is admitted through two nozzles (9a,15). All three nozzles are oriented tangentially to the cylinder so that the flames travel helically along the cylinder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10B 1/10; F27B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); C10B 1/10 (2006.01); C10B 47/30 (2006.01); F27B 7/08 (2006.01); H05B 6/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10B 47/30 (2013.01); C10B 1/10 (2013.01); F27B 7/08 (2013.01); H05B 6/6435 (2013.01); H05B 6/6458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0686686 A1 19951213; EP 0686686 B1 20000126; AT 189256 T 20000215; CN 1090305 C 20020904; CN 1114729 A 19960110; DE 69514718 D1 20000302; DE 69514718 T2 20000928; FR 2721095 A1 19951215; FR 2721095 B1 19960823; PL 176676 B1 19990730; PL 309026 A1 19951211; US 5657705 A 19970819

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050522

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU *PETROLE

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-05-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2004-07-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040705

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514718

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189256

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981005

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960613

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE GB IT LI NL