Global Patent Index - EP 0686690 B1

EP 0686690 B1 2002-11-13 - Gear and transmission lubricant compositions of improved sludge-dispersibility.

Title (en)

Gear and transmission lubricant compositions of improved sludge-dispersibility.

Title (de)

Schmiermittelzusammensetzungen für Getriebe und Kraftübertragung mit verbesserten Dispergierungseigenschaften von Schlamm.

Title (fr)

Compositions lubrifiantes pour engrenages et transmissions aux propriétés dispersantes de boues.

Publication

EP 0686690 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94304031 A

Priority

EP 94304031 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0686690A1] A gear or transmission lubricant composition, comprising a major portion of mineral base oil, containing added thereto (A) a phosphorus-containing metal-free organic compound, such as a phosphate ester or amine salt thereof, and (B) an oil-soluble copolymer of (a) an alkyl (meth)acrylate and (b) a N,N-dialkylaminoalkyl (meth)acrylate, shows improved sludge dispersibility, and is useful as automatic transmission fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 161/00; C10M 167/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 161/00 (2006.01); C10M 167/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 161/00 (2013.01); C10M 137/02 (2013.01); C10M 137/04 (2013.01); C10M 137/08 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 137/12 (2013.01); C10M 149/04 (2013.01); C10M 149/10 (2013.01); C10M 159/24 (2013.01); C10M 167/00 (2013.01); C10M 2217/022 (2013.01); C10M 2217/023 (2013.01); C10M 2217/028 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2223/02 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/043 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2223/049 (2013.01); C10M 2223/06 (2013.01); C10M 2223/061 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/02 (2013.01); C10N 2240/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/042 (2013.01); C10N 2240/044 (2013.01); C10N 2240/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0686690 A1 19951213; EP 0686690 B1 20021113; DE 69431710 D1 20021219; DE 69431710 T2 20030724

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-19 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050420

2005-10-19 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050420

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050602

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-08 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROEHM GMBH CHEMISCHE FABRIK

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431710 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-04-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GEAR AND TRANSMISSION LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS OF IMPROVED SLUDGE-DISPERSIBILITY.

2002-04-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF GEAR AND TRANSMISSION LUBRICANT COMPOSITIONS OF IMPROVED SLUDGE-DISPERSIBILITY.

1997-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970514

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941231

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB