Global Patent Index - EP 0686721 B1

EP 0686721 B1 2000-05-10 - Method for optimising water utilisation in a washing machine, washing-drying machine or the like during the use thereof

Title (en)

Method for optimising water utilisation in a washing machine, washing-drying machine or the like during the use thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Optimieren der Wasserausnutzung in Waschmaschinen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour optimiser l'utilisation de l'eau dans les machines à laver

Publication

EP 0686721 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94108840 A

Priority

EP 94108840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0686721A1] A method for optimizing water utilization in a washing machine, washing-drying machine or the like during its use, said machine operating a wash program on a load or clothes placed in its usual drum (2) rotating within a tub (3), said program comprising a wash and a plurality of successive rinse stages, the weight of the load in the drum being evaluated in order to define the water quantity to be used at least for the first rinse stage; according to the method, this evaluation is effected using fuzzy logic, this fuzzy logic being successively utilized to evaluate the water quantity to be used for the rinse stages subsequent to the first. The invention also relates to the device for implementing the said method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0686721 A1 19951213; EP 0686721 B1 20000510; DE 69424409 D1 20000615; DE 69424409 T2 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140611

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140608

2014-07-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140608

2014-06-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69424409

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130605

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424409 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970618

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960601

1995-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB