Global patent index - EP 0687324 B1

EP 0687324 B1 2000-01-19 - SECURITY PAPER COMPRISING LOCALISED AREAS WITH REDUCED THICKNESS AND OPACITY, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (en)

SECURITY PAPER COMPRISING LOCALISED AREAS WITH REDUCED THICKNESS AND OPACITY, AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSPAPIER MIT REDUZIERTER DICKE UND OPAZITÄT IN LOKALEN BEREICHEN UND DAS VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PAPIER DE SECURITE COMPORTANT DES ZONES LOCALISEES D'EPAISSEUR ET D'OPACITE REDUITES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0687324 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94908388 A

Priority

  • FR 9400225 W
  • FR 9302373 A
  • FR 9311485 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9420679A1] A method for making a paper sheet comprising at least one region which is thinner than the rest of the sheet. According to the method, a first paper layer (3) is formed on a wire in a first wet end of a paper-making machine, a second paper layer (5) is formed on a wire in a second wet end of the paper-making machine, one of the two paper layers has a number of localised thinner regions (8) so that the thickness (e2) of said paper layers in said regions is up to 50 % less than the thickness (et) of the rest of the sheet, and the two layers are joined together and dried. The resulting paper may be used in banknotes or cheques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 11/08; D21F 1/44; D21F 11/00; D21H 21/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/44 (2006.01); D21F 11/00 (2006.01); D21F 11/08 (2006.01); D21H 21/40 (2006.01); D21H 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/06 (2013.01); D21F 1/44 (2013.01); D21F 11/006 (2013.01); D21F 11/08 (2013.01); D21H 21/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9420679 A1 19940915; DE 69422705 D1 20000224; DE 69422705 T2 20001005; DE 69422705 T3 20060817; EP 0687324 A1 19951220; EP 0687324 B1 20000119; EP 0687324 B2 20051207; ES 2142937 T3 20000501; ES 2142937 T5 20060716; US 6402888 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130302

2014-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140606

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69422705

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-10-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-07-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Date of Ref Document: 20060220

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2006-05-10 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-05-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2006-02-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-30 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2005-12-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2005-12-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY

2003-07-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-07-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ARJO WIGGINS SECURITY SAS

2003-03-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: ARJO WIGGINS SECURITY SAS

2002-10-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-10-31 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142937

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69422705

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARJO WIGGINS S.A.

1996-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960419

1995-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950821

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL