Global Patent Index - EP 0687333 B1

EP 0687333 B1 2000-02-02 - DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR INTRODUCING A HARDENABLE LIQUID INTO AN ABSORBENT SOLID

Title (en)

DEVICE AND PROCESS FOR INTRODUCING A HARDENABLE LIQUID INTO AN ABSORBENT SOLID

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINBRINGEN EINER AUSHÄRTBAREN FLÜSSIGKEIT IN EINEN SAUGFÄHIGEN FESTKÖRPER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR L'INTRODUCTION D'UN LIQUIDE DE DURCISSEMENT DANS UN CORPS SOLIDE A POUVOIR ABSORBANT

Publication

EP 0687333 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93920660 A

Priority

  • DE 9300909 W
  • DE 4306687 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9420700A1] A device for introducing a hardenable liquid (1), especially a capillary waterproofing agent, into an absorbent solid (2), preferably masonry, concrete or timber, with a reservoir (3) containing the liquid (1) and a discharge device (4) connected to the reservoir (3) to conduct the liquid (1) to at least one drilling (5) made in the solid (2), is constructed for the effective introduction into a solid (2) having internal cracks (11), gaps, spaces, large pores, etc., in such a way that the discharge device (4) has an absorbent swelling body (6) at least partly filling the drilling (5). A process for using the device of the invention is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/64

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/648 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4306687 A1 19940908; DE 4306687 C2 19960222; AT 189497 T 20000215; EP 0687333 A1 19951220; EP 0687333 B1 20000202; WO 9420700 A1 19940915

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130925

2013-09-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59309948

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020924

2001-10-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TERBORG HERMANN

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-08-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-06-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59309948 20000309

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI

2000-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189497 T 20000215

1996-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960104

1995-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950928

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI