Global patent index - EP 0687481 B1

EP 0687481 B1 2000-03-22 - Method and device to control the power supply to a valve for hydraulic tools

Title (en)

Method and device to control the power supply to a valve for hydraulic tools

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Speisung eines Stellgliedes für ein hydraulisches Werkzeug

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de commande d'alimentation de vérin de manoeuvre d'outils hydrauliques

Publication

EP 0687481 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95430004 A

Priority

FR 9407680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0687481A1] The system consists of a control handle (3) for the tool (1), and a flexible line (4) connecting it to a hydraulic fluid source which can be pressurised. The handle also has a switch (7) for operating the fluid pressurising drive. The actuating cylinder (2) for the tool (1) has a chamber (8) to receive the pressure fluid, situated on one side and its piston (10). The chamber (9) on the opposite side of the piston contains any elastically compressible substance which is able to oppose the piston's movement. The control handle has a moving section (39) and an inner duct (14) which connects the flexible line to the hydraulic cylinder through two tubes (14.1,14.2) with valves (12,13) controlled by the moving section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 3/00; B25F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 3/00 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25F 5/005 (2013.01); A62B 3/005 (2013.01); F15B 15/1476 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0687481 A1 19951220; EP 0687481 B1 20000322; DE 69515727 D1 20000427; DE 69515727 T2 20000907; ES 2144594 T3 20000616; FR 2721359 A1 19951222; FR 2721359 B1 19960913

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120609

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-05-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69515727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120608

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120608

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144594

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515727

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990611

1996-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960411

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB