Global patent index - EP 0687508 B1

EP 0687508 B1 2000-12-13 - Apparatus for conveying vulnerable articles in the article holders

Title (en)

Apparatus for conveying vulnerable articles in the article holders

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Fördern empfindlicher Artikel mit Greifer

Title (fr)

Appareil pour le transport d'articles vulnérables dans des organes de préhension

Publication

EP 0687508 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95201583 A

Priority

  • JP 32480795 A
  • NL 9400969 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0687508A1] An apparatus comprising a conveyor (1) having article holders for conveying vulnerable articles (V), such as for instance fruits, in the article holders (2), the artices (V) during conveyance being subjected to a treatment for the purpose of the classification of the products, such as for instance a weighing treatment, the article holders being grippers (2) adapted to assume two stable positions, i.e. a gripping position wherein the articles (V) are grippingly receivable in the gripper, and a release position wherein articles (V) received in the gripper (2) are released in downward direction, the grippers (2) being designed so that in the gripping position articles (V) of different dimensions are receivable therein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/18; B65G 47/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 35/08 (2006.01); B07C 5/18 (2006.01); B65G 17/32 (2006.01); B65G 47/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/18 (2013.01); B65G 17/323 (2013.01); B65G 47/90 (2013.01); B65G 2201/02 (2013.01); B65G 2201/0211 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0687508 A1 19951220; EP 0687508 B1 20001213; DE 69519601 D1 20010118; DE 69519601 T2 20010621; ES 2155109 T3 20010501; JP 3854328 B2 20061206; JP H09165011 A 19970624; NL 9400969 A 19960102; US 5703332 A 19971230; ZA 9504926 B 19960215

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150615

2015-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-06-24 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20150614

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140703

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110614

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69519601

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-02-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110614

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155109

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519601

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-18

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980804

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980804

1996-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960320

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL