Global Patent Index - EP 0687580 B1

EP 0687580 B1 2000-04-26 - Surface coating process for imitating the appearance of natural wood

Title (en)

Surface coating process for imitating the appearance of natural wood

Title (de)

Oberflächenbeschichtungsverfahren zur Erzielung eines Wurzelholzimitat-Effektes

Title (fr)

Procédé de revêtement de surface pour l'imitation de l'aspect du bois naturel

Publication

EP 0687580 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94120524 A

Priority

DE 4421111 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0687580A2] Surface coating processes for producing an imitation root timber effect comprise (A) (1) applying a layer of filler with a colour which determines the base shade of the final effect; (2) air-drying the filler coat; (3) preparing a soln. of scumble paste in water; (4) applying this soln. to the filler coat; (5) trickling or spotting alcohol, spirit, isopropanol, acetone, EtOAc, etc., onto the still-wet scumble coat to form the root timber pattern; (6) drying rapidly; (7) applying and drying opt. coloured clearcoat(s); and (8) applying clear topcoat(s); (B) (a) performing stages (1)-(4) as above; (b)(5) sprinkling salt grains on the still-wet scumble to form the pattern; and (c) performing stages (6)-(8) as above; (C) to produce the effect on glass, (1) cleaning and degreasing a glass plate, etc.; (2) coating with an adhesive clear varnish or transparent adhesive and drying this; (3) applying a scumble coat as in (A) and (B) stage (4); (4) forming the pattern as in (A)(5) and drying this; (5) coating with an acrylic scumble coloured to match the shade of the first scumble (3); (6) applying a primer paint coloured to match the ground colour of the imitation root timber layer; and (7) applying a coat(s) of protective varnish.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44F 9/02; B05D 3/10; B05D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 1/38 (2006.01); B05D 1/36 (2006.01); B05D 3/10 (2006.01); B05D 5/06 (2006.01); B44F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 5/061 (2013.01); B05D 3/107 (2013.01); B44F 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0687580 A2 19951220; EP 0687580 A3 19960717; EP 0687580 B1 20000426; AT 192094 T 20000515; CZ 9501376 A3 19960214; DE 4421111 C1 19960208; JP H0838993 A 19960213

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-02 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20011005

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: WALTER MAURER G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001223

2000-10-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409314 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192094 T 20000515

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970116

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE