Global Patent Index - EP 0687761 B1

EP 0687761 B1 2000-11-02 - Multiprogram washing machine with an electromechanical programmer and a digital microcontroller

Title (en)

Multiprogram washing machine with an electromechanical programmer and a digital microcontroller

Title (de)

Mehrprogramm-waschmaschine mit einem elektromechanischen Schaltwerk und einer digitalen Steuereinheit

Title (fr)

Machine à laver à programmes multiples avec un programmateur électromécanique et un microcontrôleur digital

Publication

EP 0687761 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109280 A

Priority

IT TO940497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0687761A1] A multiprogram washing machine is described, comprising an electromechanical programmer (T, MT, A1-A12, B1-B12, C1-C12, D1-D12) for selecting a plurality of washing programs and an electronic microcontroller (ME,MP) for controlling, during said programs, the operation of a motor (M) being provided in said machine, wherein the programmer delivers control codes to said microcontroller; the main characteristics of the described washing machine consists in that at least a control element (A) is provided for modifying the codes sent from the electromechanical programmer (T, MT, A1-A12, B1-B12, C1-C12, D1-D12) to the electronic microcontroller (ME,MP), in order to extend the number of washing programs available in the machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/005 (2013.01); D06F 2212/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0687761 A1 19951220; EP 0687761 B1 20001102; DE 69519255 D1 20001207; DE 69519255 T2 20010607; ES 2152344 T3 20010201; IT 1266862 B1 19970121; IT TO940497 A1 19951218; IT TO940497 D0 19940616

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090616

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152344 T3

2001-01-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519255 20001207

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR

2000-11-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001102

1997-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970728

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960525

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR