Global Patent Index - EP 0687819 B1

EP 0687819 B1 2002-09-18 - Fastening device for at least two elements, e.g. for automobile bodywork

Title (en)

Fastening device for at least two elements, e.g. for automobile bodywork

Title (de)

Befestigungsvorrichtung für mindestens zwei Bauteile, z. B. Fahrzeugkarosserie

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'assemblage d'au moins deux éléments par exemple de carrosserie automobile

Publication

EP 0687819 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401149 A

Priority

FR 9406131 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0687819A2] The assembly unit (1) is made up of a rod (7) extended by a head (9), a compression spring (3) acting against the internal surface (4a) of the first item to be assembled which is made solid with the free end (8) of the rod (7). This rod penetrates a drilling (15) provided in the wall of the first element (4) and an extended slot (12) provided in the second element to be assembled (10). This extended slot corresponds to that of the head (9) so that when the unit (1) is in the unlocked position the head (9) is aligned with the slot (12) and by turning the head by a quarter turn, the head is retained in a recess (2c) in an indexing plate (2) which is part of the first element (4) thus clamping the two elements (4,10) together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16B 5/10; F16B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 13/02 (2006.01); B62D 27/04 (2006.01); B62D 29/04 (2006.01); F16B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16B 5/10 (2013.01); B60R 13/0206 (2013.01); B62D 27/04 (2013.01); B62D 29/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0687819 A2 19951220; EP 0687819 A3 19961218; EP 0687819 B1 20020918; DE 69528215 D1 20021024; DE 69528215 T2 20030508; ES 2182877 T3 20030316; FR 2720126 A1 19951124; FR 2720126 B1 19960809

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090517

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090518

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090517

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090517

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090603

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080508

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-02-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20070117

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182877 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528215 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980803

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970329

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT