Global Patent Index - EP 0688002 B1

EP 0688002 B1 2000-11-02 - Method for selecting stopping positions of reels in a gaming machine

Title (en)

Method for selecting stopping positions of reels in a gaming machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Anhaltelagen der Walzen einer Spielmaschine

Title (fr)

Méthode pour sélecter des positions d'arrêt des roues d'une machine à sous

Publication

EP 0688002 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95303808 A

Priority

  • US 25978694 A
  • US 44798895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688002A1] A method of implementing desired odds for a reel-type slot machine is disclosed. All of the possible reel stop combinations are assigned to unique terminal nodes in one or more fractional branching trees stored in a ROM. The tree(s) (38) comprises a main tier (40), a plurality of lower tiers (44,46,48,50,52,54) and a plurality of terminal nodes. Each of the tiers has a number of entries which lead either to a lower tier or to a terminal node. A random number generator is used to select entries on each tier until a terminal node is selected. The reel stop combination or a particular symbol assigned to the terminal node is then displayed on the pay line and an award is paid based on a pay table. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/04 (2006.01); G07F 17/32 (2006.01); G07F 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3244 (2013.01); G07F 17/3265 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688002 A1 19951220; EP 0688002 B1 20001102; AU 2047395 A 19961205; AU 698647 B2 19981105; DE 69519257 D1 20001207; DE 69519257 T2 20010523; ES 2151026 T3 20001216; GR 3034756 T3 20010228; JP 2003175157 A 20030624; JP H08164238 A 19960625

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060605

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050606

2006-06-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060605

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050606

2005-06-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050605

2005-06-01 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050601

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-04-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-12-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20010628

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-06-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010611

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151026 T3

2000-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519257 20001207

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981008

1996-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960522

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE