Global Patent Index - EP 0688112 B1

EP 0688112 B1 2001-05-16 - Program interruption control method of RDS receiver

Title (en)

Program interruption control method of RDS receiver

Title (de)

Verfahren eines RDS Empfängers zur Steuerung einer Programmunterbrechung

Title (fr)

Méthode dans un récepteur RDS pour contrôler l'interruption d'un programme

Publication

EP 0688112 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109101 A

Priority

JP 13293894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688112A1] A reception control method whereby when an interruption reception is performed to an arbitrary information program of other network, a reception situation of the information program of the other network of which the broadcasting was started is correctly notified to the user and a proper correspondence can be used in accordance with the reception situation. When a PTY burst signal such that same EON information of the group type 14A and comprising an information classification code (Usage Code = 13) of the second block is transmitted a plurality of number of times in a short time is received, whether a preset information program of which the interruption reception is desired coincides with an information program shown by a program type code (PTY(ON)) in the received PTY burst signal or not is detected. When they coincide, whether broadcasting station frequency data of the other network which broadcasts the relevant information program has already been read in a memory in the receiver or not is detected. When the broadcasting station frequency data is not read yet, such a fact is notified by a desired method. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 20/22 (2013.01); H04H 60/74 (2013.01); H04H 40/27 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0687082 A1 19951213 - PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688112 A1 19951220; EP 0688112 B1 20010516; EP 0688112 B2 20050907; DE 69520911 D1 20010621; DE 69520911 T2 20010830; DE 69520911 T3 20060524; JP 3260556 B2 20020225; JP H088772 A 19960112

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120613

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120613

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-05-26 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2005-09-07 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-09-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFTFUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE GM

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-04-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFT FUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE G

- Effective date: 20000218

2002-01-04 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69520911 20010621

2001-06-20 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-09-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROGRAM INTERRUPTION CONTROL METHOD OF RDS RECEIVER

2000-05-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROGRAM INTERRUPTION CONTROL METHOD OF RDS RECEIVER

1996-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951108

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB