Global patent index - EP 0688146 B1

EP 0688146 B1 2000-04-26 - Method for controlling a microwave oven, microwave oven and its use for cooking or heating food in accordance with the method

Title (en)

Method for controlling a microwave oven, microwave oven and its use for cooking or heating food in accordance with the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Steueren eines Mikrowellenofens, Mikrowellenofen und seine Verwendung zum Kochen oder Erwarmen eines Nahrungmittels nach diesem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé de commande d'un four à micro-ondes, four à micro-ondes et son utilisation pour la cuisson ou le chauffage d'aliments selon ce procédé

Publication

EP 0688146 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95104003 A

Priority

  • EP 95104003 A
  • SE 9402061 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688146A2] A method for controlling a microwave oven, a microwave oven and its use for automatic cooking or heating of food are disclosed. Food-category information, which is based on the type of food and its initial state, is supplied to the oven for the selection of a corresponding preprogrammed control program. The control program is divided into time periods, during which the microwave radiation source of the oven, a microwave-activable crisp plate (4) and a grill element, if any, are activated at power levels determined by the program. The implementation of the program is monitored by one or more sensors for sensing humidity emission or other substance emission from the food and/or the temperature of the food. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/68; H05B 6/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6482 (2013.01); H05B 6/645 (2013.01); H05B 6/6458 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688146 A2 19951220; EP 0688146 A3 19961106; EP 0688146 B1 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110318

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110318

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69516458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110318

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100330

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100406

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-03-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030306

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. A. GIAMBROCONO & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69516458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

2000-04-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000426

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990809

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970421

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

1995-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB GR IT LI