Global Patent Index - EP 0688259 B1

EP 0688259 B1 2000-04-12 - TOOL HANDLE

Title (en)

TOOL HANDLE

Title (de)

WERKZEUGHEFT

Title (fr)

MANCHE D'OUTIL

Publication

EP 0688259 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95906360 A

Priority

  • FR 9500003 W
  • FR 9400217 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9518701A1] A tool handle formed of two or three materials comprises, along at least one part of its length, an outer envelope (24) made from flexible grade polyester elastomer moulded over a support handle (22) made from hard grade polyester elastomer. Application to various types of hand tools.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25G 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25G 1/105 (2013.01); B25G 1/10 (2013.01); Y10S 16/12 (2013.01); Y10T 16/476 (2013.01); Y10T 16/498 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9518701 A1 19950713; DE 69516212 D1 20000518; DE 69516212 T2 20001109; EP 0688259 A1 19951227; EP 0688259 B1 20000412; ES 2147283 T3 20000901; FR 2714863 A1 19950713; FR 2714863 B1 19960329; JP H08507475 A 19960813; US 5740586 A 19980421

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130104

2014-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140324

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130103

2013-11-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69516212

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090104

2011-04-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STANLEY WORKS (EUROPE) AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FACOM S.A., MORANGIS, FR

- Document: DE 69516212

- Effective date: 20110218

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090103

2009-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090103

2009-09-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147283 T3

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516212 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE

1997-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970807

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950727

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI SE