Global Patent Index - EP 0688612 B1

EP 0688612 B1 2000-05-03 - Dolly block

Title (en)

Dolly block

Title (de)

Amboss

Title (fr)

Tas de tolerie

Publication

EP 0688612 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95420167 A

Priority

FR 9407978 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688612A1] The sheet metal anvil is made up of two elements (1,2) of elongated and variable thickness. At one of each of their ends is a terminal portion (5,6) lightly curved and thinned, and at the other, thicker end (9,14), two rounded ribs (10,13,11,12) whose radius of curvature is different. The upper faces (3,4) of the anvil are curved in the transverse and longitudinal sections. The radii of longitudinal and transverse curvature of the upper and lower surfaces of the anvils are determined by set parameters. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 1/06; B25D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/06 (2006.01); B25D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/06 (2013.01); B25D 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688612 A1 19951227; EP 0688612 B1 20000503; DE 69516583 D1 20000608; FR 2721545 A1 19951229; FR 2721545 B1 19960823

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000630

2001-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-08-04 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000804

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516583 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980306

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960521

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT