Global Patent Index - EP 0688735 B1

EP 0688735 B1 2000-01-19 - Elevator machinery and its installation

Title (en)

Elevator machinery and its installation

Title (de)

Aufzugsantrieb und sein Einbau

Title (fr)

Machinerie d'ascenseur et son montage

Publication

EP 0688735 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95109094 A

Priority

FI 943043 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688735A2] An elevator machinery (1) with a disc type motor is mounted on one of the guide rails (6) of the elevator car or counterweight. The guide rail (6) constitutes a part adding to the mechanical strength of the elevator machinery. The vertical forces applied to the traction sheave (4) by the elevator ropes are passed to the guide rail (6) via the rolling center of a bearing. The elevator machinery is provided with a damping system to absorb vibrations and oscillations. The elevator machinery (1) of the invention is light in weight, needs only a small space when mounted and is inexpensive to manufacture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/04 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0045 (2013.01); B66B 11/0438 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688735 A2 19951227; EP 0688735 A3 19960508; EP 0688735 B1 20000119; AT 188945 T 20000215; AU 2173595 A 19960111; AU 693542 B2 19980702; BR 9502924 A 19960130; CA 2152292 A1 19951224; CA 2152292 C 20040831; CN 1081162 C 20020320; CN 1117938 A 19960306; DE 688735 T1 19980409; DE 69514574 D1 20000224; DE 69514574 T2 20000907; DK 0688735 T3 20000619; EP 0891939 A1 19990120; ES 2141865 T3 20000401; FI 943043 A0 19940623; FI 95689 B 19951130; FI 95689 C 19960311; GR 3033252 T3 20000929; JP 2777340 B2 19980716; JP H0840676 A 19960213; PT 688735 E 20000531; RU 2139829 C1 19991020; RU 95110779 A 19970520

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150613

2015-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150614

2015-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150925

2015-09-03 [REG GR MA] RIGHT EXPIRED

- Document: GR 20000400935

- Effective date: 20150614

2015-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 188945 T

- Effective date: 20150613

2015-08-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-07-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20150612

2015-07-29 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2015-07-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20150612

2015-06-24 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20150613

2015-06-22 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20150613

2015-06-15 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20150613

2015-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-06-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69514574

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-09-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20140603

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20140624

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140611

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-05-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2000-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141865 T3

2000-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69514574 20000224

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19950629;LV PAYMENT 19950629;SI PAYMENT 19950629

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 188945 T 20000215

1998-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONE CORPORATION

1998-04-09 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980205

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961031

1996-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 950629;LV PAYMENT 950629;SI PAYMENT 950629

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-12-27 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 950629;LV PAYMENT 950629;SI PAYMENT 950629