Global patent index - EP 0688891 B1

EP 0688891 B1 2000-08-16 - Process of manufacturing a technical belt

Title (en)

Process of manufacturing a technical belt

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines technischen Gurtes

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une sangle technique

Publication

EP 0688891 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95107506 A

Priority

DE 4417498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688891A1] The belt material, to carry dust matter through a fluidising stage, has a number of paired beadings (2,2a; 3,3al 4,4a) in the belt (1) woven parallel to each other on the warp direction using one or more filler warps (16,26,36), between the woven layers (1a,1b). The filler warps (16,26,36) are woven across the width of the woven belt (1) so that the outer edges (12-14) of the developed beadings are at intervals (L2-L4) according to the required belt (30,40) width. The beadings (2a,3; 3a,4) of adjacent pairs are at smaller intervals (Z) to be cut through the centre (5), and the cut edges are sealed. Also claimed is a belt with the beading filler warps (16,26,36), between the wefts (9) of the outer woven layers (1a,1b). Pref. the filler warps (16,26,36) are woven in bundles and irregularly, fixed by the bonding warps (8,8a) across the longitudinal line of the woven material to give the cutting line between them. The beadings are woven into the belt material (1) to give different interval lengths (L2-L4) between the beadings in the pairs. A bundle of pref. 40-50 filler warps (16,26,36) in irregular bundles (17,27,37) are used to form the beadings, held across the wefts (9) by the bonding warps (8,8a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 11/02; D03D 3/08; D03J 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 11/02 (2006.01); D03J 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03J 1/08 (2013.01); D03D 11/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688891 A1 19951227; EP 0688891 B1 20000816

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100517

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100517

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100517

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-11-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508638

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-21

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1996-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960531

1996-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960418

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT