Global Patent Index - EP 0688999 B1

EP 0688999 B1 2000-05-24 - Vehicle headlight having in particular an elliptical reflector and emitting a beam having two selectively switchable cut-off lines

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight having in particular an elliptical reflector and emitting a beam having two selectively switchable cut-off lines

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfer insbesondere mit elliptischem Reflektor zum Emittieren eines Lichtbündels mit zwei selektiv umschaltbaren Lichtbegrenzungen

Title (fr)

Projecteur automobile, en particulier à réflecteur elliptique, produisant un faisceau susceptible de deux coupures sélectivement commutables

Publication

EP 0688999 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401495 A

Priority

FR 9407709 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0688999A1] The motor vehicle lamp includes a light source and an elliptical reflector defining the light beam. These cooperate with a shutter screen inserted in the beam in order to define the cut-off for the beam. The shutter screen includes a fixed lamella (1) and a mobile flap (2) extending in the same plane, the mobile flap moving between raised and withdrawn positions. The two positions of the mobile flap define two different cut-off profiles for the beam. The mobile flap slides in vertically (direction delta), with support rods linked to an actuator (5). The actuator moves the flap in one direction, and a spring returns it in the other direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 14/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 14/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1773 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0688999 A1 19951227; EP 0688999 B1 20000524; DE 69517095 D1 20000629; DE 69517095 T2 20001102; FR 2721685 A1 19951229; FR 2721685 B1 19960913

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-06-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517095

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 21V 14/08 A

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980914

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960617

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT