Global Patent Index - EP 0689026 B1

EP 0689026 B1 2000-03-01 - System to brake the movement of the hammer in a firearm

Title (en)

System to brake the movement of the hammer in a firearm

Title (de)

Bremssystem für die Bewegung des Hahns einer Feuerwaffe

Title (fr)

Système pour freiner le mouvement du marteau d'une arme

Publication

EP 0689026 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95401099 A

Priority

FR 9407356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0689026A1] The braking component (20) turns about a pivot (36) and is linked to the component (10) being braked by a rod (22) which extends perpendicular to the components' two pivots (12,36). The rod is pivoted to the braked component and passed freely through an aperture (40) in the braking component, while an arming spring (14) is fitted around the rod and applies a pressure to the braking component. The two pivots are situated at different distances from the axis of the rod to provide two opposite thrust forces on the ends of the braking and braked components, with the latter in the form of a hammer in a small calibre firearm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0689026 A1 19951227; EP 0689026 B1 20000301; AT 190130 T 20000315; DE 69515215 D1 20000406; DE 69515215 T2 20000713; FR 2721388 A1 19951222; FR 2721388 B1 19960814; US 5653051 A 19970805

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69515215

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130511

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 190130 T

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2009-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2009-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NEXTER SYSTEMS

- Free text: GIAT INDUSTRIES#13, ROUTE DE LA MINIERE#78000 VERSAILLES (FR) -TRANSFER TO- NEXTER SYSTEMS#34, BOULEVARD DE VALMY#42300 ROANNE (FR)

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-20 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-01 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515215 20000406

2000-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI PT

2000-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190130 T 20000315

1998-10-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980819

1996-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960219

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI PT