Global Patent Index - EP 0689191 B1

EP 0689191 B1 2001-05-23 - Speech processing apparatus and mobile transceiver

Title (en)

Speech processing apparatus and mobile transceiver

Title (de)

Sprachverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Mobilfunkendgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement de paroles et émetteur-récepteur mobile

Publication

EP 0689191 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95201578 A

Priority

DE 4421853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5647006A] A mobile radio terminal comprises a speech processor for processing a first and at least a further speech signal formed by noise and speech signal components and available as sample values. The sampled further speech signal is delayed by an adjustable delay value. Control means are provided which are used for forming gradient estimates. The control means are additionally used for recursively determining delay estimates from the gradient estimates. By rounding the delay estimates, the delay values are formed. Furthermore, their mutually time-shifted speech signals are added together by means of an adder device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/10 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 2021/02166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5647006 A 19970708; DE 4421853 A1 19960104; EP 0689191 A2 19951227; EP 0689191 A3 19970528; EP 0689191 B1 20010523; JP H0818473 A 19960119

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050614

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050614

2004-08-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040813

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-04 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20021111

2002-11-22 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509271 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2000-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SPEECH PROCESSING APPARATUS AND MOBILE TRANSCEIVER

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1998-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971128

1997-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB